OH HB372 | 2007-2008 | 127th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-24 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-24 - Effective Date
Summary
To amend sections 124.23, 124.93, 125.111, 153.59, 153.591, 176.04, 176.06, 717.01, 1751.18, 2101.16, 2927.03, 3905.55, 4112.01, 4112.02, 4112.021, 4112.04, 4112.05, 4112.08, 4117.19, 4503.571, 4735.16, 4735.55, 5533.09, 5747.01, 5903.10, and 5903.12 and to enact sections 1349.04, 2101.164, 4112.023, 4503.433, 4503.731, and 5903.121 of the Revised Code to exempt estates of armed forces members who died while serving in a combat zone from probate fees, to exempt military retirement pay from the income tax, to provide that reservists and National Guard members may renew their professional licenses within six months after active duty service, to extend continuing education reporting periods for National Guard members ordered to duty by the Governor, to provide that standard "Purple Heart" license plates be issued without charge, to designate Interstate Routes 70 and 71 as the "Purple Heart Trail," to authorize the display of combat battle stars on certain special combat or military license plates, to prohibit discrimination under the Ohio Civil Rights Commission Law and certain other laws on the basis of military status, to require the Attorney General to appoint a staff member of the Consumer Protection Division to expedite certain cases or issues raised by a person, or the person's immediate family, who is deployed on active duty, to grant certain military persons additional civil service credit, to require relevant military experience to be considered in continuing education determinations, to create an incumbent worker training program, and to create Civil Air Patrol license plates.
Title
Military and veteran benefits-probate fees/ income tax/licensing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-24 | Effective Date | |
2007-12-20 | Governor Action | |
2007-12-31 | End of 10-day Period | |
2007-12-19 | Sent to Governor | |
2007-12-12 | Concurrence | |
2007-12-12 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2007-12-12 | Committee Report | |
2007-11-08 | To Ways & Means & Economic Development | |
2007-11-08 | Introduced to Senate | |
2007-11-07 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2007-11-07 | Committee Report | |
2007-10-30 | To Infrastructure, Homeland Security & Veterans Affairs | |
2007-10-30 | Introduced to House |
Ohio State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/bills.cfm?ID=127_HB_372 |