OH HB366 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 37-7)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Effective 3/28/19 - Most provisions effective March 28, 2019; certain provisions effective September 28, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 3119.01, 3119.02, 3119.021, 3119.04, 3119.05, 3119.06, 3119.22, 3119.23, 3119.24, 3119.29, 3119.30, 3119.302, 3119.31, 3119.32, 3119.61, 3119.63, 3119.76, 3119.79, 3119.89, 3121.36, and 3123.14; to enact new sections 3119.022 and 3119.023 and sections 3119.051, 3119.231, and 3119.303; and to repeal sections 3119.022, 3119.023, and 3119.024 of the Revised Code to make changes to the laws governing child support.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change laws governing child support

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28 Effective 3/28/19 - Most provisions effective March 28, 2019; certain provisions effective September 28, 2018
2018-06-07HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2018-05-16SenatePassed
2018-05-15SenateReported - Substitute: Judiciary
2018-03-21SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2018-03-12SenateIntroduced
2018-03-07HousePassed
2018-02-01HouseReported: Community and Family Advancement
2017-10-10HouseRefer to Committee: Community and Family Advancement
2017-10-02HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
31Amended CodeCitation Text
3119Amended CodeCitation Text
311901Amended CodeCitation Text
311902Amended CodeCitation Text
3119021Amended CodeCitation Text
3119022Repealed CodeCitation Text
3119023Repealed CodeCitation Text
3119024Repealed CodeCitation Text
311904Amended CodeCitation Text
311905Amended CodeCitation Text
311906Amended CodeCitation Text
311922Amended CodeCitation Text
311923Amended CodeCitation Text
311924Amended CodeCitation Text
311929Amended CodeCitation Text
311930Amended CodeCitation Text
3119302Amended CodeCitation Text
311931Amended CodeCitation Text
311932Amended CodeCitation Text
311961Amended CodeCitation Text
311963Amended CodeCitation Text
311976Amended CodeCitation Text
311979Amended CodeCitation Text
311989Amended CodeCitation Text
3121Amended CodeCitation Text
312136Amended CodeCitation Text
3123Amended CodeCitation Text
312314Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback