OH HB365 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 54-11)
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend section 5747.01 of the Revised Code to allow taxpayers who claim an enhanced federal income tax depreciation deduction to reduce the amount of the deduction the taxpayer must add-back for Ohio income tax purposes if the taxpayer increases payroll in the year the enhanced federal deduction is taken by at least ten per cent over the preceding year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To allow taxpayers who claim an enhanced federal income tax depreciation deduction to reduce the amount of the deduction the taxpayer must add-back for Ohio income tax purposes if the taxpayer increases payroll in the year the enhanced federal deduction is taken by at least ten per cent over the preceding year.

Sponsors

Rep. John Adams [R]Rep. Richard Adams [R]Rep. Ron Amstutz [R]Rep. Marlene Anielski [R]
Sen. Nickie Antonio [D]Rep. Nan Baker [R]Rep. John Barnes [D]Rep. William Batchelder [R]
Sen. Bill Beagle [R]Rep. Peter Beck [R]Rep. Terry Blair [R]Rep. Louis Blessing [R]
Rep. Terry Boose [R]Rep. Barbara Boyd [D]Sen. Andrew Brenner [R]Rep. Danny Bubp [R]
Rep. Jim Buchy [R]Rep. James Butler [R]Rep. Courtney Combs [R]Rep. Margaret Conditt [R]
Rep. Rex Damschroder [R]Rep. Timothy Derickson [R]Rep. Anthony DeVitis [R]Rep. Mike Dovilla [R]
Rep. Mike Duffey [R]Sen. Randall Gardner [R]Rep. Nancy Garland [D]Rep. Cheryl Grossman [R]
Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Rep. Christina Hagan [R]Rep. David Hall [R]Rep. Bill Hayes [R]
Rep. Michael Henne [R]Sen. Brian Hill [R]Rep. Richard Hollington [R]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]
Sen. Terry Johnson [R]Rep. Casey Kozlowski [R]Rep. Al Landis [R]Rep. Thomas Letson [D]
Rep. Ron Maag [R]Rep. Jarrod Martin [R]Rep. Ross McGregor [R]Rep. Zack Milkovich [D]
Rep. Craig Newbold [R]Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]Rep. Jon Peterson [R]Sen. Kristina Roegner [R]
Rep. Philip Rose [R]Rep. Clifford Rosenberger [R]Rep. Margaret Ruhl [R]Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]
Rep. Kirk Schuring [R]Rep. Barbara Sears [R]Rep. Lynn Slaby [R]Rep. Stephen Slesnick [D]
Rep. Robert Sprague [R]Rep. Gerald Stebelton [R]Rep. Michael Stinziano [D]Rep. Matthew Szollosi [D]
Sen. Louis Terhar [R]Rep. Andy Thompson [R]Sen. Joseph Uecker [R]Rep. Roland Winburn [D]
Rep. Ron Young [R]

Roll Calls

2012-11-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-13 Effective Date
2012-12-11 Governor' Action
2012-12-15 End of 10-day period
2012-12-04 Sent to Governor
2012-11-14 Concurrence
2012-11-14 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2012-05-10 Committee Report
2012-02-09 To Ways & Means & Economic Development
2012-02-09 Introduced to Senate
2012-02-08 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2012-01-26 Committee Report - S
2011-11-01 To Ways & Means
2011-11-01 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5747Amended CodeCitation Text
574701Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback