OH HB364 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To enact section 5.2521 of the Revised Code to designate February 13 as "Aortic Aneurysm Awareness Day."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designate Aortic Aneurysm Awareness Day

Sponsors

Rep. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]Rep. Gil Blair [D]Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]
Rep. Janine Boyd [D]Rep. Juanita Brent [D]Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. James Butler [R]
Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]Rep. Randi Clites [D]Rep. Erica Crawley [D]
Rep. Jon Cross [R]Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]Rep. Robert Cupp [R]Rep. Anthony DeVitis [R]
Rep. Bill Dean [R]Rep. Sedrick Denson [D]Rep. Mark Fraizer [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]
Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Doug Green [R]Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]
Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]Rep. Paula Hicks-Hudson [D]Rep. Brett Hudson Hillyer [R]Rep. James Hoops [R]
Rep. Stephanie Howse [D]Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]Rep. Don Jones [R]Sen. Kris Jordan [R]
Rep. Candice Keller [R]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]Rep. David Leland [D]
Rep. Michele Lepore-hagan [D]Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]Rep. Scott Lipps [R]Rep. Beth Liston [D]
Rep. Joe Miller [D]Rep. Jessica Miranda [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]
Rep. John Patterson [D]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Rick Perales [R]Rep. Phil Plummer [R]
Rep. Bill Reineke [R]Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Phil Robinson [D]
Rep. Bill Roemer [R]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Allison Russo [D]Rep. Gary Scherer [R]
Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Michael Skindell [D]Rep. Kent Smith [D]Rep. Todd Smith [R]
Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Fred Strahorn [D]Rep. Bride Sweeney [D]
Rep. Emilia Strong Sykes [D]Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Scott Wiggam [R]
Rep. Paul Zeltwanger [R]

Roll Calls

2020-02-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-14SenateIntroduced
2020-02-12HousePassed
2019-11-19HouseReported: Health
2019-10-22HouseRefer to Committee: Health
2019-10-10HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback