OH HB361 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-12 - Reported - Substitute: Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-12 - Reported - Substitute: Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 120.52, 120.521, 120.53, 1901.26, 1907.24, 2303.201, 3953.231, 4705.10, and 5715.19 of the Revised Code to increase the time within which boards of revision must decide property tax complaints and to change the name of the Ohio Legal Assistance Foundation to the Ohio Access to Justice Foundation.
Title
Increase time for deciding property tax complaints
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-12 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-12 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Ways and Means |
2018-07-10 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-06-20 | House | Passed |
2017-12-07 | House | Reported - Amended: Government Accountability and Oversight |
2017-10-10 | House | Refer to Committee: Government Accountability and Oversight |
2017-09-26 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 20 | 52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 20 | 521 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 20 | 53 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
19 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
19 | 01 | 26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
19 | 07 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
23 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
23 | 03 | 201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
39 | 53 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
39 | 53 | 231 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 05 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 15 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |