OH HB353 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 33-8)
Status: Passed on January 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-22 - Effective 1/22/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 33-8)
Status: Passed on January 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-22 - Effective 1/22/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 169.01 of the Revised Code to make changes to the exemptions under the Unclaimed Funds Law.
Title
Exempt loop credit and reward cards from Unclaimed Funds Law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-09-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-22 | Effective 1/22/19 | |
2018-09-25 | Senate | Passed |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Reported: Finance |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Finance |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-17 | House | Passed |
2017-12-12 | House | Reported - Substitute: Financial Institutions, Housing, and Urban Development |
2017-10-10 | House | Refer to Committee: Financial Institutions, Housing, and Urban Development |
2017-09-20 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 69 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 69 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |