OH HB35 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-05 - To Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-05 - To Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 9.33, 126.06, 127.14, 153.01, 153.65, 164.05, 307.05, 307.051, 307.055, 505.37, 505.375, 505.44, 505.72, 718.01, 3705.242, 3791.12, 3791.13, 3791.99, 4501.03, 4501.04, 4501.041, 4501.042, 4501.043, 4501.06, 4503.04, 4503.042, 4503.07, 4503.42, 4503.45, 4503.49, 4504.19, 4504.21, 4506.08, 4506.09, 4507.011, 4507.05, 4507.23, 4511.13, 4513.263, 4513.34, 4513.53, 4513.66, 4517.021, 4561.21, 4743.05, 4765.02, 4765.03, 4765.04, 4765.05, 4765.06, 4765.07, 4765.08, 4765.09, 4765.10, 4765.101, 4765.102, 4765.11, 4765.111, 4765.112, 4765.113, 4765.114, 4765.115, 4765.116, 4765.12, 4765.15, 4765.16, 4765.17, 4765.18, 4765.22, 4765.23, 4765.28, 4765.29, 4765.30, 4765.31, 4765.32, 4765.33, 4765.37, 4765.38, 4765.39, 4765.40, 4765.42, 4765.48, 4765.49, 4765.55, 4765.56, 4766.01, 4766.03, 4766.04, 4766.05, 4766.07, 4766.08, 4766.09, 4766.10, 4766.11, 4766.12, 4766.13, 4766.15, 4766.22, 5501.03, 5501.51, 5501.73, 5501.77, 5502.01, 5503.01, 5503.03, 5503.04, 5515.01, 5517.02, 5525.01, 5525.16, 5577.04, 5577.05, 5739.02, 5747.01, 5751.01, 5751.02, 5751.051, and 5751.20; to enact sections 4501.031, 4765.59, 5517.021, and 5553.051; and to repeal sections 126.60, 126.601, 126.602, 126.603, 126.604, 126.605, 3791.11, 4766.02, 4766.20, 4981.36, and 4981.361 of the Revised Code; to amend Section 10 of Am. Sub. H.B. 386 of the 129th General Assembly; and to amend Sections 203.80 and 203.83 of Sub. H.B. 482 of the 129th General Assembly; to amend the versions of sections 4503.04 and 4507.05 of the Revised Code that are scheduled to take effect January 1, 2017, to continue the amendments by this act on and after that effective date; to make appropriations for programs related to transportation and public safety for the biennium beginning July 1, 2013, and ending June 30, 2015, and to provide authorization and conditions for the operation of those programs.
Title
That are scheduled to take effect January 1, 2017, to continue the amendments by this act on and after that effective date; to make appropriations for programs related to transportation and public safety for the biennium beginning July 1, 2013, and ending June 30, 2015, and to provide authorization and conditions for the operation of those programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-28 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 62 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 59 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 56 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 57 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 59 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 58 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 58 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 57 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 59 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 56 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 57 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 59 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 58 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 58 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 57 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | To Transportation | |
2013-03-05 | Introduced to Senate | |
2013-02-28 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-02-27 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-02-05 | To Finance and Appropriations | |
2013-02-05 | Introduced to House |