OH HB341 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 51-29)
Status: Passed on September 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-16 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 51-29)
Status: Passed on September 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-16 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 4715.14, 4715.30, 4715.302, 4723.28, 4723.486, 4723.487, 4725.092, 4725.16, 4725.19, 4729.12, 4729.80, 4729.86, 4730.25, 4730.48, 4730.53, 4731.055, 4731.22, and 4731.281 and to enact sections 4121.443 and 4729.861 of the Revised Code to establish requirements to be followed by prescribers in reviewing patient information in the State Board of Pharmacy's Ohio Automated Rx Reporting System.
Title
To establish requirements to be followed by prescribers in reviewing patient information in the State Board of Pharmacy's Ohio Automated Rx Reporting System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-03 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-16 | Effective Date | |
2014-06-16 | Governor' Action | |
2014-06-27 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-06-16 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-06-03 | Concurrence | |
2014-05-28 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-05-28 | Committee Report - S | |
2014-03-13 | To Insurance & Financial Institutions | |
2014-03-13 | Introduced to Senate | |
2014-03-12 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-02-25 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-11-07 | To Health and Aging | |
2013-11-07 | Introduced to House |