OH HB340 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 66-39)
Status: Passed on May 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-25 - Effective 9/13/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 66-39)
Status: Passed on May 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-25 - Effective 9/13/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 5.2527 of the Revised Code to designate September as "International Underground Railroad Month."
Title
Designate International Underground Railroad Month
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-01 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-01 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | Effective 9/13/22 | |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Passed |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Reported: Government Oversight and Reform |
2021-12-15 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-12-08 | House | Passed |
2021-11-01 | House | Reported: State and Local Government |
2021-06-10 | House | Refer to Committee: State and Local Government |
2021-06-07 | House | Introduced |