OH HB325 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 57-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-03-02 - Refer to Committee: Veterans and Public Safety
Pending: Senate Veterans and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend section 3761.16 and to enact section 5502.411 of the Revised Code regarding a political subdivision's emergency powers when suppressing a riot, mob, or potential riot or mob and the preservation of rights regarding firearms during an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards emergency powers when suppressing a riot; firearms rights

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-02-16 - House - House Passed (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-02SenateRefer to Committee: Veterans and Public Safety
2022-02-16HousePassed
2022-02-09HouseReported: Government Oversight
2021-06-10HouseRefer to Committee: Government Oversight
2021-05-25HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
376116Amended CodeCitation Text
5502411New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-325
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb325/IN/00/hb325_00_IN?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb325/RH/01/hb325_01_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb325/PH/02/hb325_02_PH?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17446&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17558&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18304&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18348&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18415&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=19571&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-325

Bill Comments

feedback