OH HB325 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 77-45)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend section 5533.774 and to enact sections 5533.052, 5533.071, 5533.094, 5533.095, 5533.104, 5533.121, 5533.171, 5533.254, 5533.301, 5533.321, 5533.322, 5533.323, 5533.356, 5533.357, 5533.358, 5533.377, 5533.378, 5533.379, 5533.461, 5533.608, 5533.624, 5533.625, 5533.626, 5533.627, 5533.628, 5533.629, 5533.645, 5533.646, 5533.648, 5533.689, 5533.6810, 5533.752, 5533.768, 5533.769, 5533.861, 5533.901, 5533.902, 5533.961, 5533.971, 5533.972, 5533.973, 5533.974, 5533.975, 5533.976, 5533.977, 5533.978, 5533.979, 5533.98, 5533.981, 5533.982, 5533.983, and 5533.984 of the Revised Code to designate a number of memorial highways.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To designate a number of memorial highways.

Sponsors

Rep. Richard Adams [R]Rep. Marlene Anielski [R]Rep. Nickie Antonio [D]Rep. Michael Ashford [D]
Sen. Kevin Bacon [R]Rep. Nan Baker [R]Sen. Troy Balderson [R]Rep. William Batchelder [R]
Sen. Bill Beagle [R]Rep. Peter Beck [R]Rep. Terry Blair [R]Rep. Terry Boose [R]
Rep. Kevin Boyce [D]Rep. Barbara Boyd [D]Sen. Edna Brown [D]Rep. Danny Bubp [R]
Rep. Jim Buchy [R]Rep. Armond Budish [D]Sen. Dave Burke [R]Rep. James Butler [R]
Sen. Capri Cafaro [D]Rep. John Carney [D]Rep. Nicholas Celebrezze [D]Rep. Ted Celeste [D]
Rep. Jack Cera [D]Rep. Kathleen Clyde [D]Sen. William Coley [R]Rep. Courtney Combs [R]
Rep. Margaret Conditt [R]Rep. Rex Damschroder [R]Rep. Timothy Derickson [R]Rep. Anthony DeVitis [R]
Rep. Mike Dovilla [R]Rep. Denise Driehaus [D]Rep. Mike Duffey [R]Sen. John Eklund [R]
Rep. Keith Faber [R]Rep. Teresa Fedor [D]Rep. Lorraine Fende [D]Rep. Mike Foley [D]
Sen. Randall Gardner [R]Rep. Nancy Garland [D]Sen. Lou Gentile [D]Rep. Ronald Gerberry [D]
Rep. Bruce Goodwin [R]Rep. Jay Goyal [D]Rep. Cheryl Grossman [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]
Rep. Christina Hagan [R]Rep. Robert Hagan [D]Rep. David Hall [R]Rep. Bill Hayes [R]
Rep. Tracy Heard [D]Rep. Michael Henne [R]Rep. Brian Hill [R]Sen. Cliff Hite [R]
Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Sen. Matt Huffman [R]Sen. Jim Hughes [R]Rep. Terry Johnson [R]
Sen. Shannon Jones [R]Sen. Kris Jordan [R]Sen. Eric Kearney [D]Rep. Casey Kozlowski [R]
Rep. Al Landis [R]Sen. Frank LaRose [R]Sen. Peggy Lehner [R]Rep. Thomas Letson [D]
Rep. Matt Lundy [D]Rep. Matthew Lynch [R]Rep. Ron Maag [R]Rep. Dale Mallory [D]
Sen. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Jarrod Martin [R]Rep. Jeffrey McClain [R]Rep. Ross McGregor [R]
Rep. Zack Milkovich [D]Rep. Dennis Murray [D]Rep. Craig Newbold [R]Sen. Tom Niehaus [R]
Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]Sen. Larry Obhof [R]Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]Rep. Mark Okey [D]
Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Dorothy Pelanda [R]Sen. Bob Peterson [R]Rep. Debbie Phillips [D]
Rep. Connie Pillich [D]Rep. Daniel Ramos [D]Rep. Kristina Roegner [R]Rep. Clifford Rosenberger [R]
Rep. Margaret Ruhl [R]Sen. Thomas Sawyer [D]Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]Rep. Gary Scherer [R]
Sen. Joseph Schiavoni [D]Rep. Kirk Schuring [R]Rep. Barbara Sears [R]Rep. William Seitz [R]
Sen. Michael Skindell [D]Rep. Marilyn Slaby [R]Rep. Ryan Smith [R]Sen. Shirley Smith [D]
Rep. Robert Sprague [R]Rep. Peter Stautberg [R]Rep. Gerald Stebelton [R]Rep. Michael Stinziano [D]
Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]Rep. Matthew Szollosi [D]Sen. Charleta Tavares [D]Sen. Louis Terhar [R]
Rep. Andy Thompson [R]Sen. Nina Turner [D]Sen. Joseph Uecker [R]Rep. Lynn Wachtmann [R]
Sen. Mark Wagoner [R]Sen. Christopher Widener [R]Sen. Sandra Williams [D]Rep. Roland Winburn [D]
Rep. Ron Young [R]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2012-12-05 - House - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-22 Effective Date
2012-12-20 Governor' Action
2012-12-27 End of 10-day period
2012-12-14 Sent to Governor
2012-12-05 Concurrence
2012-12-04 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2012-11-29 Committee Report - S
2012-05-17 To Highways & Transportation
2012-05-17 Introduced to Senate
2012-05-16 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2012-05-16 Committee Report* A
2011-09-14 To Transportation, Public Safety & Homeland Security
2011-09-14 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
55New CodeSee Bill Text
5533New CodeSee Bill Text
5533051Amended CodeCitation Text
5533052New CodeSee Bill Text
5533071New CodeSee Bill Text
5533094New CodeSee Bill Text
5533095New CodeSee Bill Text
5533104New CodeSee Bill Text
5533121New CodeSee Bill Text
5533171New CodeSee Bill Text
5533221New CodeSee Bill Text
5533254New CodeSee Bill Text
5533301New CodeSee Bill Text
5533321New CodeSee Bill Text
5533322New CodeSee Bill Text
5533323New CodeSee Bill Text
5533356New CodeSee Bill Text
5533357New CodeSee Bill Text
5533358New CodeSee Bill Text
5533377New CodeSee Bill Text
5533378New CodeSee Bill Text
5533379New CodeSee Bill Text
5533461New CodeSee Bill Text
5533608New CodeSee Bill Text
5533624New CodeSee Bill Text
5533625New CodeSee Bill Text
5533626New CodeSee Bill Text
5533627New CodeSee Bill Text
5533628New CodeSee Bill Text
5533629New CodeSee Bill Text
5533645New CodeSee Bill Text
5533646New CodeSee Bill Text
5533648New CodeSee Bill Text
55336810New CodeSee Bill Text
5533688New CodeSee Bill Text
5533689New CodeSee Bill Text
5533752New CodeSee Bill Text
5533768New CodeSee Bill Text
5533769New CodeSee Bill Text
5533774Amended CodeCitation Text
5533775New CodeSee Bill Text
5533831New CodeSee Bill Text
5533832New CodeSee Bill Text
5533861New CodeSee Bill Text
5533901New CodeSee Bill Text
5533902New CodeSee Bill Text
5533961New CodeSee Bill Text
5533971New CodeSee Bill Text
5533972New CodeSee Bill Text
5533973New CodeSee Bill Text
5533974New CodeSee Bill Text
5533975New CodeSee Bill Text
5533976New CodeSee Bill Text
5533977New CodeSee Bill Text
5533978New CodeSee Bill Text
5533979New CodeSee Bill Text
553398New CodeSee Bill Text
5533981New CodeSee Bill Text
5533982New CodeSee Bill Text
5533983New CodeSee Bill Text
5533984New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback