OH HB310 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-02 - Refer to Committee: Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-02 - Refer to Committee: Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 2903.31, 3301.22, 3313.661, 3313.666, 3314.03, and 3326.11 and to enact sections 2903.311, 3301.165, 3313.669, 3319.318, and 3345.19 of the Revised Code to enact Collin's Law: The "Ohio Anti-Bullying and Hazing Act" with regard to school discipline and bullying and hazing policies at schools and colleges.
Title
Enacts Anti-Bullying and Hazing Act
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Greenspan [R] | Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R] | Rep. Thomas Patton [R] | Rep. John Rogers [D] |
Rep. Michael Sheehy [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-11-19 - House - House Passed (Y: 74 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-19 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-19 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-02 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Education |
2020-11-24 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-11-19 | House | Passed - Amended |
2020-11-19 | House | Reported - Substitute: Primary and Secondary Education |
2019-09-24 | House | Refer to Committee: Primary and Secondary Education |
2019-07-09 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 03 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 03 | 311 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
33 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 01 | 165 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 01 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 13 | 661 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 13 | 666 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 13 | 669 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 14 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
33 | 19 | 318 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 26 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 26 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 45 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
33 | 45 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |