OH HB305 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-28 - Effective 9/28/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-28 - Effective 9/28/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 143.09, 145.011, and 3309.011 and to enact section 143.091 of the Revised Code to include certain nonteaching employees of The University of Akron as members in the Public Employees Retirement System and to retroactively extend eligibility for benefits from the Volunteer Peace Officers' Dependents Fund regarding volunteer peace officers who are totally and permanently disabled or killed in the line of duty.
Title
Includes University of Akron nonteaching employees in PERS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-09 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-09 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-28 | Effective 9/28/16 | |
2016-05-24 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Passed - Amended |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Reported - Amended: State and Local Government |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Refer to Committee: State and Local Government |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-02-23 | House | Passed |
2016-02-17 | House | Reported - Substitute: Finance |
2016-02-02 | House | Re-referred: Finance |
2016-01-26 | House | Re-referred: Rules and Reference |
2015-12-09 | House | Reported - Substitute: Health and Aging |
2015-09-16 | House | Refer to Committee: Health and Aging |
2015-08-25 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 43 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 43 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 43 | 091 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 45 | 011 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
33 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 09 | 011 | Amended Code | Citation Text |