OH HB295 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Engrossed on October 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-11-13 - Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
Pending: Senate Transportation, Commerce and Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 4501.01, 4509.01, 4511.01, and 4511.68 and to enact section 4511.514 of the Revised Code to establish requirements governing low-speed electric scooters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establish requirements for low-speed electric scooters

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-10-23 - House - House Passed (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-16 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-13SenateRefer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
2019-10-28SenateIntroduced
2019-10-23HousePassed
2019-10-16HouseReported: Transportation and Public Safety
2019-06-25HouseRefer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety
2019-06-19HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
45Amended CodeCitation Text
4501Amended CodeCitation Text
450101Amended CodeCitation Text
4509Amended CodeCitation Text
450901Amended CodeCitation Text
4511Amended CodeCitation Text
451101Amended CodeCitation Text
4511514New CodeSee Bill Text
451168Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback