OH HB292 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-9)
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-11-23 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend section 5739.02 and to enact sections 4501.82 and 4501.821 of the Revised Code to create a temporary sales tax exemption for electric vehicle production parts and to create the Electric Vehicle Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Create Electric Vehicle Commission; temporary sales tax on parts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-11-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 81 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-23SenateIntroduced
2021-11-18HousePassed
2021-10-27HouseReported - Amended: Transportation and Public Safety
2021-05-11HouseRefer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety
2021-05-06HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
450182New CodeSee Bill Text
4501821New CodeSee Bill Text
573902Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-292
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb292/IN/00/hb292_00_IN?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb292/RH/01/hb292_01_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb292/PH/02/hb292_02_PH?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17113&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17554&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17694&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17722&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17914&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-292

Bill Comments

feedback