OH HB292 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 33-7)
Status: Passed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - Effective 9/13/18 - Emergency: Certain sections effective 6/14/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 122.6510, 124.134, 124.136, 124.152, 124.82, 124.87, 125.211, 126.231, 133.06, 323.31, 3317.021, 3375.404, 4123.932, 4503.066, 5717.04, and 5747.24 and to enact section 5709.57 of the Revised Code and to amend Section 221.10 of Am. Sub. H.B. 49 of the 132nd General Assembly and Sections 203.10, 207.100, 207.150, 207.170, 207.240, 207.260, 207.280, 207.290, 207.340, 221.13, 223.10, 223.15, 227.10, 237.10, 237.13, 253.100, 253.250, and 285.10 of H.B. 529 of the 132nd General Assembly to modify the test for determining an individual's state of residence for income tax purposes, to make appropriations and otherwise provide authorization and conditions for the operation of state programs, and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modify residence test for income tax purposes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-23 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-26 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-13 Effective 9/13/18 - Emergency: Certain sections effective 6/14/18
2018-06-07HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2018-05-23SenatePassed
2018-05-23SenateReported - Substitute: Ways and Means
2017-11-15SenateRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2017-11-02SenateIntroduced
2017-11-01HousePassed
2017-10-26HouseReported: Ways and Means
2017-09-12HouseRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2017-06-27HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
122Amended CodeCitation Text
1226510Amended CodeCitation Text
124Amended CodeCitation Text
124134Amended CodeCitation Text
124136Amended CodeCitation Text
124152Amended CodeCitation Text
12482Amended CodeCitation Text
12487Amended CodeCitation Text
125Amended CodeCitation Text
125211Amended CodeCitation Text
126Amended CodeCitation Text
126231Amended CodeCitation Text
133Amended CodeCitation Text
13306Amended CodeCitation Text
3Amended CodeCitation Text
323Amended CodeCitation Text
32331Amended CodeCitation Text
33Amended CodeCitation Text
3317Amended CodeCitation Text
3317021Amended CodeCitation Text
3375Amended CodeCitation Text
3375404Amended CodeCitation Text
41Amended CodeCitation Text
4123Amended CodeCitation Text
4123932Amended CodeCitation Text
45Amended CodeCitation Text
4503Amended CodeCitation Text
4503066Amended CodeCitation Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5709New CodeSee Bill Text
570957New CodeSee Bill Text
5717Amended CodeCitation Text
571704Amended CodeCitation Text
5747Amended CodeCitation Text
574724Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback