OH HB289 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-03-20 - Effective
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 2930.02, 2950.01, 2950.04, 2950.042, 2950.05, 2950.07, and 2951.041 and to repeal section 2930.071 of the Revised Code to provide that if a Tier I or Tier II sex offender/child-victim offender fails to comply with duties under the SORN law, the period of time that the offender has a duty to comply is tolled during the time of the failure, to require a sex offender/child-victim offender to register a fixed residence address or provide a detailed description of the places at which the offender or delinquent child intends to stay under the SORN Law, to require the Department of Rehabilitation and Correction, under specified circumstances, to notify the sheriff of a receiving county when an offender who is required to register as a sex offender will be transported to that county upon release, and to repeal procedures relating to a subpoena of victims' records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards SORN law compliance; add new sexually oriented offense

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-12-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-12-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-12-11 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-10 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2025-03-20 Effective
2024-12-19 Signed By The Governor
2024-12-17 Sent To The Governor
2024-12-11HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2024-12-11SenatePassed
2024-12-11SenateReported - Substitute: Judiciary
2024-06-25SenateReferred to committee: Judiciary
2024-06-17SenateIntroduced
2024-06-12HousePassed
2024-06-10HouseReported - Substitute: Criminal Justice
2023-10-03HouseReferred to committee: Criminal Justice
2023-10-02HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
293002Amended CodeCitation Text
2930071Repealed CodeCitation Text
295001Amended CodeCitation Text
295004Amended CodeCitation Text
2950042Amended CodeCitation Text
295005Amended CodeCitation Text
295007Amended CodeCitation Text
2951041Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/135/hb289
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/api/v2/general_assembly_135/legislation/hb289/00_IN/pdf/
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/api/v2/general_assembly_135/legislation/hb289/01_RH/pdf/
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/api/v2/general_assembly_135/legislation/hb289/02_PH/pdf/
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=21677
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=21771
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=22717
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=22905
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=22900
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=22941
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=23038
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=23458
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/135/hb289/votes

Bill Comments

feedback