OH HB286 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Refer to Committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 107.43, 119.12, 124.34, 956.11, 956.15, 2743.03, 3794.09, 3901.321, 3913.13, 3913.23, 5101.35, and 5164.38 and to enact sections 303.57, 519.26, and 713.16 of the Revised Code to generally change the venue in which appeal from an agency order is proper to the local court of common pleas, to provide that a civil action to challenge a state administrative order issued in a state of emergency be brought in the Court of Claims, and to revise the law governing claim preclusion in zoning appeals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change the venue for appeal from an agency order

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-30 - House - House Passed (Y: 60 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-06SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2022-04-05SenateIntroduced
2022-03-30HousePassed
2022-03-29HouseReported - Substitute: Rules and Reference
2022-03-21HouseRe-referred: Rules and Reference
2021-06-23HouseReported - Substitute: Civil Justice
2021-05-05HouseRefer to Committee: Civil Justice
2021-05-04HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10743Amended CodeCitation Text
11912Amended CodeCitation Text
12434Amended CodeCitation Text
274303Amended CodeCitation Text
30357New CodeSee Bill Text
379409Amended CodeCitation Text
3901321Amended CodeCitation Text
391313Amended CodeCitation Text
391323Amended CodeCitation Text
51926New CodeSee Bill Text
510135Amended CodeCitation Text
516438Amended CodeCitation Text
71316New CodeSee Bill Text
95611Amended CodeCitation Text
95615Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-286
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb286/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb286/RH/01/hb286_01_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb286/RH/02/hb286_02_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb286/PH/03/hb286_03_PH?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16714&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16831&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17185&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17189&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18733&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18768&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18766&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18816&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=19060&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-286

Bill Comments

feedback