OH HB285 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-15 - Effective 9/15/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To enact sections 4510.101, 4510.102, 4510.103, 4510.104, 4510.105, 4510.106, 4510.107, and 4510.108 of the Revised Code to establish a permanent Driver's License Reinstatement Fee Debt Reduction and Amnesty Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establish Driver's License Reinstatement Fee Debt Reduction Prog.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-20 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-15 Effective 9/15/20
2020-05-28HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2020-05-20SenatePassed
2020-05-15SenateReported - Substitute: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
2019-11-13SenateRefer to Committee: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
2019-11-07SenateIntroduced
2019-11-06HousePassed
2019-10-30HouseReported - Substitute: Transportation and Public Safety
2019-06-18HouseRefer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety
2019-06-12HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
45New CodeSee Bill Text
4510New CodeSee Bill Text
4510101New CodeSee Bill Text
4510102New CodeSee Bill Text
4510103New CodeSee Bill Text
4510104New CodeSee Bill Text
4510105New CodeSee Bill Text
4510106New CodeSee Bill Text
4510107New CodeSee Bill Text
4510108New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback