OH HB285 | 2007-2008 | 127th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-09-16 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-09-16 - Effective Date
Summary
To enact section 119.14 of the Revised Code to waive fines or penalties for paperwork violations that are first-time offenses committed by small businesses.
Title
Small businesses-paperwork violations-waive penalties if first time offense
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-09-16 | Effective Date | |
2008-06-17 | Governor Action | |
2008-06-17 | End of 10-day Period | |
2008-06-05 | Sent to Governor | |
2008-05-28 | Concurrence | |
2008-05-22 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2008-05-21 | Committee Report | |
2008-03-11 | To State & Local Government & Veterans Affairs | |
2008-03-11 | Introduced to Senate | |
2008-03-11 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2008-02-19 | Committee Report | |
2007-07-10 | To State Government & Elections | |
2007-07-10 | Introduced to House |
Ohio State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/bills.cfm?ID=127_HB_285 |