OH HB279 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-10)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Reported - Substitute: Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 2125.02, 2125.03, and 2125.04 of the Revised Code to revise the law regarding wrongful death claims.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards wrongful death claims

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-01SenateReported - Substitute: Judiciary
2021-09-08SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2021-06-25HousePassed
2021-06-23HouseReported - Substitute: Civil Justice
2021-05-04HouseRefer to Committee: Civil Justice
2021-05-03HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
212502Amended CodeCitation Text
212503Amended CodeCitation Text
212504Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-279
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb279/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb279/RH/01/hb279_01_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb279/PH/02/hb279_02_PH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb279/RS/03/hb279_03_RS?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16695&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16833&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17166&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17190&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17259&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17394&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=19369&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=19396&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=19394&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-279

Bill Comments

feedback