OH HB276 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 66-33)
Status: Passed on June 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-04 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 1.61, 303.01, 303.21, 519.01, 519.21, 901.511, 903.10, 929.01, 1309.102, 1311.55, 1729.01, 3781.06, 5501.50, and 5713.30 of the Revised Code to include algaculture in the laws governing agriculture, in the definition of "agriculture" for purposes of the laws governing county and township zoning, and in the laws governing current agricultural use valuation; to exclude from zoning restrictions the production from certain feedstocks of biodiesel, biomass energy, electric or heat energy, and biologically derived methane gas; to include that production in the laws governing current agricultural use valuation; to provide for the establishment of best management practices for that production under the Concentrated Animal Feeding Facilities Law; to establish the Legislative Task Force to Study Anaerobic Digesters for Agricultural Use and Application in the State; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To include algaculture in the laws governing agriculture, in the definition of "agriculture" for purposes of the laws governing county and township zoning, and in the laws governing current agricultural use valuation; to exclude from zoning restrictions the production from certain feedstocks of biodiesel, biomass energy, electric or heat energy, and biologically derived methane gas; to include that production in the laws governing current agricultural use valuation; to provide for the establishment of best management practices for that production under the Concentrated Animal Feeding Facilities Law; to establish the Legislative Task Force to Study Anaerobic Digesters for Agricultural Use and Application in the State; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors

Rep. Richard Adams [R]Rep. Ron Amstutz [R]Rep. Marlene Anielski [R]Rep. Nickie Antonio [D]
Sen. Kevin Bacon [R]Rep. Nan Baker [R]Sen. Troy Balderson [R]Sen. Troy Balderson [R]
Rep. John Barnes [D]Rep. William Batchelder [R]Sen. Bill Beagle [R]Rep. Terry Blair [R]
Rep. Terry Boose [R]Rep. Danny Bubp [R]Rep. Jim Buchy [R]Sen. Dave Burke [R]
Rep. James Butler [R]Sen. Capri Cafaro [D]Rep. John Carey [R]Rep. John Carney [D]
Rep. Ted Celeste [D]Sen. William Coley [R]Rep. Courtney Combs [R]Rep. Rex Damschroder [R]
Rep. Timothy DeGeeter [D]Rep. Timothy Derickson [R]Rep. Mike Dovilla [R]Rep. Denise Driehaus [D]
Rep. Mike Duffey [R]Sen. John Eklund [R]Rep. Keith Faber [R]Rep. Teresa Fedor [D]
Rep. Lorraine Fende [D]Rep. Mike Foley [D]Rep. Nancy Garland [D]Sen. Lou Gentile [D]
Sen. Lou Gentile [D]Rep. Anne Gonzales [R]Rep. Bruce Goodwin [R]Rep. Jay Goyal [D]
Rep. Cheryl Grossman [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Rep. Christina Hagan [R]Rep. David Hall [R]
Rep. Bill Hayes [R]Rep. Tracy Heard [D]Rep. Michael Henne [R]Rep. Brian Hill [R]
Sen. Cliff Hite [R]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Sen. Matt Huffman [R]Sen. Jim Hughes [R]
Rep. Terry Johnson [R]Sen. Shannon Jones [R]Sen. Eric Kearney [D]Rep. Casey Kozlowski [R]
Rep. Al Landis [R]Sen. Frank LaRose [R]Sen. Peggy Lehner [R]Rep. Thomas Letson [D]
Rep. Clayton Luckie [D]Rep. Matt Lundy [D]Rep. Ron Maag [R]Rep. Dale Mallory [D]
Sen. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Jeffrey McClain [R]Rep. Zack Milkovich [D]Rep. Dennis Murray [D]
Rep. Craig Newbold [R]Sen. Tom Niehaus [R]Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]Sen. Larry Obhof [R]
Rep. Bill Patmon [D]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Dorothy Pelanda [R]Rep. Jon Peterson [R]
Rep. Debbie Phillips [D]Rep. Daniel Ramos [D]Rep. Kristina Roegner [R]Rep. Margaret Ruhl [R]
Sen. Thomas Sawyer [D]Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]Sen. Joseph Schiavoni [D]Rep. Kirk Schuring [R]
Rep. Barbara Sears [R]Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Lynn Slaby [R]Rep. Stephen Slesnick [D]
Rep. Robert Sprague [R]Rep. Gerald Stebelton [R]Rep. Matthew Szollosi [D]Sen. Charleta Tavares [D]
Rep. Andy Thompson [R]Rep. Lynn Wachtmann [R]Sen. Mark Wagoner [R]Sen. Christopher Widener [R]
Rep. Roland Winburn [D]Rep. Ron Young [R]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2012-02-15 - House - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House - Senate Amendments - Emergency Clause (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-13 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-04 Effective Date
2012-03-02 Governor' Action
2012-03-06 End of 10-day period
2012-02-23 Sent to Governor
2012-02-15 Concurrence
2012-02-14 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2012-02-14 Committee Report - S
2011-12-14 To Agriculture, Environment & Natural Resources
2011-12-14 Introduced to Senate
2011-12-13 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2011-12-07 Committee Report - S
2011-06-21 To Agriculture & Natural Resources
2011-06-21 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
13Amended CodeCitation Text
1309Amended CodeCitation Text
1309102Amended CodeCitation Text
1311Amended CodeCitation Text
131155Amended CodeCitation Text
17Amended CodeCitation Text
1729Amended CodeCitation Text
172901Amended CodeCitation Text
3Amended CodeCitation Text
303Amended CodeCitation Text
30301Amended CodeCitation Text
30321Amended CodeCitation Text
37Amended CodeCitation Text
3781Amended CodeCitation Text
378106Amended CodeCitation Text
5Amended CodeCitation Text
519Amended CodeCitation Text
51901Amended CodeCitation Text
51921Amended CodeCitation Text
55Amended CodeCitation Text
5501Amended CodeCitation Text
550150Amended CodeCitation Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5713Amended CodeCitation Text
571330Amended CodeCitation Text
9Amended CodeCitation Text
901Amended CodeCitation Text
901511Amended CodeCitation Text
903Amended CodeCitation Text
90310Amended CodeCitation Text
929Amended CodeCitation Text
92901Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback