OH HB264 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 44-29)
Status: Passed on January 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-09 - Effective 1/9/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 6121.03 and 6121.04 of the Revised Code to allow the Ohio Water Development Authority to provide for the refinancing of loans for certain public water and waste water infrastructure projects and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Refinance loans for water and waste water infrastructure projects

Sponsors

Rep. Shane Wilkin [R]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Rep. Steven Arndt [R]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]
Rep. Gil Blair [D]Rep. Juanita Brent [D]Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]
Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]Rep. Jack Cera [D]Rep. Randi Clites [D]Rep. Erica Crawley [D]
Rep. Jon Cross [R]Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]Rep. Robert Cupp [R]Rep. Bill Dean [R]
Rep. Sedrick Denson [D]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Mark Fraizer [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]
Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Doug Green [R]Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]
Rep. Paula Hicks-Hudson [D]Rep. Brett Hudson Hillyer [R]Rep. James Hoops [R]Rep. Don Jones [R]
Rep. Darrell Kick [R]Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]Rep. Jeff LaRe [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]
Rep. George Lang [R]Rep. Michele Lepore-Hagan [D]Rep. Beth Liston [D]Rep. Don Manning [R]
Rep. Riordan McClain [R]Rep. Adam Miller [D]Rep. Jessica Miranda [D]Rep. John Patterson [D]
Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Rick Perales [R]Rep. Phil Plummer [R]Rep. Bill Reineke [R]
Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Phil Robinson [D]Rep. Bill Roemer [R]
Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Gary Scherer [R]Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]
Rep. Kent Smith [D]Rep. Todd Smith [R]Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]Rep. Dick Stein [R]
Rep. Jason Stephens [R]Rep. Fred Strahorn [D]Rep. D. J. Swearingen [R]Rep. Terrence Upchurch [D]
Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Scott Wiggam [R]Sen. Louis Blessing [R]
Sen. Dave Burke [R]Sen. Hearcel Craig [D]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Bob Peterson [R]
Sen. Michael Rulli [R]Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Steve Wilson [R]
Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2020-11-19 - House - House Failed (Y: 0 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-26 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-09 Effective 1/9/21
2020-12-22SenateConference report agreed to
2020-12-22HouseConference report agreed to: Conference Committee on H.B. 264
2020-12-14SenateConference managers: Sens. - Wilson, McColley, O'Brien: Conference Committee on H.B. 264
2020-12-14HouseConference managers: Reps. - Wilkin, Hoops, Kelly
2020-12-08SenateInsist on amendments; asks for committee of conference
2020-11-19HouseRefused to concur in Senate amendments
2020-11-18HouseAmendments laid over under the rule
2020-06-30SenatePassed
2020-06-30SenateReported - Substitute: Energy and Public Utilities
2020-05-06SenateRefer to Committee: Energy and Public Utilities
2019-12-17SenateIntroduced
2019-12-12HousePassed
2019-11-26HouseReported: State and Local Government
2019-06-04HouseRefer to Committee: State and Local Government
2019-05-28HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
61Amended CodeCitation Text
6121Amended CodeCitation Text
612103Amended CodeCitation Text
612104Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA133-HB-264
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb264/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb264/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb264/PH/02?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb264/RS/03?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb264/PS/04?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb264/CR/05?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb264/EN/06?format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA133-HB-264

Bill Comments

feedback