OH HB257 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 9 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-04-09 - Effective
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 9 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-04-09 - Effective
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 715.693, 924.12, 3307.091, 5505.04, and 5543.06 and to enact sections 121.221, 145.071, 742.071, and 3309.091 of the Revised Code to authorize certain public bodies to meet virtually.
Title
Authorize certain public bodies to meet virtually
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-12-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-12-18 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-12-11 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-29 - House - House Passed (Y: 74 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-15 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-12-18 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-12-11 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-29 - House - House Passed (Y: 74 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-15 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-04-09 | Effective | |
2025-01-08 | Signed By The Governor | |
2024-12-30 | Sent To The Governor | |
2024-12-18 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2024-12-18 | Senate | Passed |
2024-12-11 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Government Oversight |
2023-12-06 | Senate | Referred to committee: Government Oversight |
2023-12-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-11-29 | House | Passed |
2023-11-15 | House | Reported - Substitute: Government Oversight |
2023-09-12 | House | Referred to committee: Government Oversight |
2023-08-22 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Elections
State and Local Government
State and Local Government : Local Government
State and Local Government : State Government
State and Local Government
State and Local Government : Local Government
State and Local Government : State Government
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 21 | 221 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 45 | 071 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 07 | 091 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 09 | 091 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 05 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 43 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 15 | 693 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 42 | 071 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 24 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |