OH HB257 | 2007-2008 | 127th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-9)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-05-08 - To Insurance, Commerce, & Labor
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-05-08 - To Insurance, Commerce, & Labor
Summary
To amend sections 121.08 and 4745.01 and to enact sections 4768.01 to 4768.19 and 4768.99 of the Revised Code to require the licensure of home inspectors and to create the Ohio Home Inspector Board to regulate the licensure and performance of home inspectors.
Title
Home inspectors-certification/regulation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-05-08 | To Insurance, Commerce, & Labor | |
2008-05-08 | Introduced to Senate | |
2008-05-06 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2008-04-09 | Committee Report | |
2007-06-05 | To Commerce & Labor | |
2007-06-05 | Introduced to House |
Ohio State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/bills.cfm?ID=127_HB_257 |