OH HB254 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 27 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-11-10 - Refer to Committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 121.22, 149.43, 307.629, 307.99, and 4731.22 and to enact sections 307.651, 307.652, 307.653, 307.654, 307.655, 307.656, 307.657, 307.658, 307.659, and 3701.0412 of the Revised Code to provide for the establishment of domestic violence fatality review boards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for domestic violence fatality review boards

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-10-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-19 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-10SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2021-11-02SenateIntroduced
2021-10-27HousePassed
2021-10-19HouseReported - Substitute: Families, Aging, and Human Services
2021-04-14HouseRefer to Committee: Families, Aging, and Human Services
2021-04-13HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
12122Amended CodeCitation Text
14943Amended CodeCitation Text
307629Amended CodeCitation Text
307651New CodeSee Bill Text
307652New CodeSee Bill Text
307653New CodeSee Bill Text
307654New CodeSee Bill Text
307655New CodeSee Bill Text
307656New CodeSee Bill Text
307657New CodeSee Bill Text
307658New CodeSee Bill Text
307659New CodeSee Bill Text
30799Amended CodeCitation Text
37010412New CodeSee Bill Text
473122Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-254
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb254/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb254/RH/01/hb254_01_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb254/PH/02/hb254_02_PH?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16825&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17151&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17574&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17649&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17717&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17745&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-254

Bill Comments

feedback