OH HB244 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-15 - Effective 2/15/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-15 - Effective 2/15/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 5.28 of the Revised Code to designate the tenth day of November as Armed Services, Peace Officer, First Responder, and Dual Service Recognition Day.
Title
Designates a recognition day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-10-21 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-21 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-21 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-15 | Effective 2/15/16 | |
2015-10-27 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2015-10-21 | Senate | Passed - Amended |
2015-10-21 | Senate | Informally passed |
2015-10-21 | Senate | Reported: State and Local Government |
2015-10-07 | Senate | Refer to Committee: State and Local Government |
2015-10-01 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-09-30 | House | Passed |
2015-06-25 | House | Reported: Armed Services, Veterans Affairs, and Public Safety |
2015-06-11 | House | Refer to Committee: Armed Services, Veterans Affairs, and Public Safety |
2015-06-08 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Law Enforcement
Military and Veterans
Special Designations : Observances
State and Local Government
State and Local Government : Public Officials and Employees
Military and Veterans
Special Designations : Observances
State and Local Government
State and Local Government : Public Officials and Employees