OH HB242 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-05-25 - Refer to Committee: Health
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To enact section 5.294 of the Revised Code to designate April as "Autism Acceptance Month."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designate April as Autism Acceptance Month

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-25SenateRefer to Committee: Health
2022-05-24SenateIntroduced
2022-05-18HousePassed
2022-03-09HouseReported: Health
2021-04-14HouseRefer to Committee: Health
2021-03-31HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-242
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb242/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb242/RH/01/hb242_01_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb242/PH/02/hb242_02_PH?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16333&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17133&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18576&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18597&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=19125&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=19113&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-242

Bill Comments

feedback