OH HB242 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-05 - Effective 8/5/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-05 - Effective 8/5/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 5.2298 of the Revised Code to designate the fourth Sunday of July as Blue Star Mothers and Families Day.
Title
Designates a recognition day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-05 | Effective 8/5/16 | |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Passed |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Reported: State and Local Government |
2015-10-07 | Senate | Refer to Committee: State and Local Government |
2015-10-01 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-09-30 | House | Passed |
2015-06-25 | House | Reported - Amended: Armed Services, Veterans Affairs, and Public Safety |
2015-06-11 | House | Refer to Committee: Armed Services, Veterans Affairs, and Public Safety |
2015-06-08 | House | Introduced |