OH HB238 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-16 - Effective 6/1/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-16 - Effective 6/1/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 5.53 of the Revised Code to designate July 28 as Buffalo Soldiers Day.
Title
Designate July 28 as Buffalo Soldiers Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-08 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-08 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | Effective 6/1/22 | |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Passed |
2021-12-08 | Senate | Reported: Veterans and Public Safety |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Veterans and Public Safety |
2021-06-16 | House | Passed |
2021-06-09 | House | Reported: Armed Services and Veterans Affairs |
2021-04-14 | House | Refer to Committee: Armed Services and Veterans Affairs |
2021-03-31 | House | Introduced |