OH HB236 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 37-16)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-25 - Referred to committee: Health
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-25 - Referred to committee: Health
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To enact sections 3792.05 and 3792.06 of the Revised Code to prohibit a congregate care setting from denying a patient or resident access to an advocate during public health emergencies and to name this act the Never Alone Act.
Title
Enact Never Alone Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-10 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-10 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-25 | Senate | Referred to committee: Health |
2024-06-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-06-12 | House | Passed |
2024-06-10 | House | Reported - Substitute: Health Provider Services |
2023-09-12 | House | Referred to committee: Health Provider Services |
2023-07-05 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Health and Human Services : Aging
Health and Human Services : Health Care
Health and Human Services : Mental Health and Disabilities
Health and Human Services : Public Health
House Health Provider Services Committee
Senate Health Committee
Health and Human Services : Health Care
Health and Human Services : Mental Health and Disabilities
Health and Human Services : Public Health
House Health Provider Services Committee
Senate Health Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 92 | 05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 92 | 06 | New Code | See Bill Text |