OH HB224 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 71-37)
Status: Passed on October 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-27 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 3501.13, 3503.02, 3503.14, 3503.19, 3503.191, 3503.28, 3505.18, 3505.181, 3505.183, 3509.021, 3509.03, 3509.04, 3509.05, 3509.07, 3511.01, 3511.02, 3511.021, 3511.04, 3511.05, 3511.09, 3511.10, 3511.11, and 3511.14, to amend, for the purpose of adopting a new section number as indicated in parentheses, section 3511.01 (3511.011), to enact new section 3511.01 and sections 3509.10, 3511.15, and 3511.16, and to repeal sections 3503.20 and 3509.031 of the Revised Code to revise the law governing uniformed services and overseas voters, to specify that voters who provide a Social Security Number for election purposes only are required to provide the last four digits of that number, to revise the process for casting provisional ballots for voters without identification, to eliminate online voter registration, to require absent voter's ballot statements to include the voter's printed name, to make technical corrections to the laws governing elections, and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To revise the law governing uniformed services and overseas voters, to specify that voters who provide a Social Security Number for election purposes only are required to provide the last four digits of that number, to revise the process for casting provisional ballots for voters without identification, to eliminate online voter registration, to require absent voter's ballot statements to include the voter's printed name, to make technical corrections to the laws governing elections, and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors

Rep. John Adams [R]Rep. Richard Adams [R]Rep. Ron Amstutz [R]Rep. Marlene Anielski [R]
Rep. Nickie Antonio [D]Rep. Michael Ashford [D]Sen. Kevin Bacon [R]Rep. Nan Baker [R]
Sen. Troy Balderson [R]Rep. John Barnes [D]Rep. William Batchelder [R]Rep. Peter Beck [R]
Rep. Terry Blair [R]Rep. Louis Blessing [R]Rep. Terry Boose [R]Rep. Barbara Boyd [D]
Rep. Andrew Brenner [R]Sen. Edna Brown [D]Rep. Danny Bubp [R]Rep. Jim Buchy [R]
Rep. Armond Budish [D]Rep. James Butler [R]Rep. John Carney [D]Rep. Ted Celeste [D]
Rep. Kathleen Clyde [D]Sen. William Coley [R]Rep. Courtney Combs [R]Rep. Margaret Conditt [R]
Rep. Rex Damschroder [R]Sen. David Daniels [R]Rep. Timothy DeGeeter [D]Rep. Timothy Derickson [R]
Rep. Mike Dovilla [R]Rep. Denise Driehaus [D]Rep. Mike Duffey [R]Rep. Keith Faber [R]
Sen. Randall Gardner [R]Rep. Nancy Garland [D]Sen. Lou Gentile [D]Rep. Ronald Gerberry [D]
Rep. Jay Goyal [D]Rep. Timothy Grendell [R]Rep. Cheryl Grossman [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]
Rep. Christina Hagan [R]Rep. Robert Hagan [D]Rep. David Hall [R]Rep. Bill Hayes [R]
Rep. Tracy Heard [D]Rep. Michael Henne [R]Sen. Cliff Hite [R]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]
Sen. Matt Huffman [R]Sen. Jim Hughes [R]Rep. Terry Johnson [R]Sen. Kris Jordan [R]
Rep. Casey Kozlowski [R]Rep. Al Landis [R]Sen. Frank LaRose [R]Sen. Peggy Lehner [R]
Rep. Thomas Letson [D]Rep. Matt Lundy [D]Rep. Ron Maag [R]Rep. Dale Mallory [D]
Sen. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Jarrod Martin [R]Rep. Jeffrey McClain [R]Rep. Ross McGregor [R]
Rep. Todd McKenney [R]Rep. Robery Mecklenborg [R]Rep. Zack Milkovich [D]Rep. Dennis Murray [D]
Rep. Craig Newbold [R]Sen. Tom Niehaus [R]Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]
Rep. Bill Patmon [D]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Jon Peterson [R]Rep. Debbie Phillips [D]
Rep. Connie Pillich [D]Rep. Daniel Ramos [D]Rep. Alicia Reece [D]Rep. Kristina Roegner [R]
Rep. Clifford Rosenberger [R]Rep. Margaret Ruhl [R]Sen. Thomas Sawyer [D]Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]
Rep. Kirk Schuring [R]Rep. Barbara Sears [R]Rep. Lynn Slaby [R]Rep. Robert Sprague [R]
Rep. Peter Stautberg [R]Rep. Gerald Stebelton [R]Rep. Michael Stinziano [D]Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]
Rep. Matthew Szollosi [D]Rep. Andy Thompson [R]Sen. Nina Turner [D]Sen. Joseph Uecker [R]
Rep. Lynn Wachtmann [R]Sen. Mark Wagoner [R]Rep. Carlton Weddington [D]Sen. Christopher Widener [R]
Sen. Jason Wilson [D]Rep. Roland Winburn [D]Rep. Ron Young [R]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2011-07-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-13 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-13 - House - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-13 - House - House - Senate Amendments - Emergency Clause (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 59 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-10-27 Effective Date
2011-07-27 Governor' Action
2011-08-01 End of 10-day period
2011-07-20 Sent to Governor
2011-07-13 Concurrence
2011-07-13 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2011-07-13 Committee Report - S
2011-06-24 To State & Local Government & Veterans Affairs
2011-06-24 Introduced to Senate
2011-06-23 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2011-06-15 Committee Report
2011-05-11 To State Government & Elections
2011-05-11 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
35Amended CodeCitation Text
3501Amended CodeCitation Text
350113Amended CodeCitation Text
3503Amended CodeCitation Text
350302Amended CodeCitation Text
350314Amended CodeCitation Text
350319Amended CodeCitation Text
3503191Amended CodeCitation Text
350320Repealed CodeCitation Text
350328Amended CodeCitation Text
3505Amended CodeCitation Text
350518Amended CodeCitation Text
3505181Amended CodeCitation Text
3505183Amended CodeCitation Text
3509Amended CodeCitation Text
3509021Amended CodeCitation Text
350903Amended CodeCitation Text
3509031Repealed CodeCitation Text
350904Amended CodeCitation Text
350905Amended CodeCitation Text
350907Amended CodeCitation Text
3511Amended CodeCitation Text
351101Amended CodeCitation Text
351102Amended CodeCitation Text
3511021Amended CodeCitation Text
351104Amended CodeCitation Text
351105Amended CodeCitation Text
351109Amended CodeCitation Text
351110Amended CodeCitation Text
351111Amended CodeCitation Text
351114Amended CodeCitation Text
351115New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback