OH HB22 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-09-08 - Refer to Committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend section 2921.32 of the Revised Code to expand the offense of obstructing justice to include failure to follow a lawful order from a law enforcement officer, diverting a law enforcement officer's attention, and throwing an object at a law enforcement officer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expand the offense of obstructing justice

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 61 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-08SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2021-06-25HousePassed
2021-06-24HouseReported - Substitute: Criminal Justice
2021-02-04HouseRefer to Committee: Criminal Justice
2021-02-03HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
292132Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-22
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb22/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb22/RH/01/hb22_01_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb22/PH/02/hb22_02_PH?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15685&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15865&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16389&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17200&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17183&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17204&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17258&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-22

Bill Comments

feedback