OH HB218 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 39-23)
Status: Passed on December 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-26 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 39-23)
Status: Passed on December 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-26 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 1751.11, 1751.33, 1751.35, 1751.66, 1751.77, 1751.78, 1751.811, 1751.83, 1751.87, 1751.89, 3901.045, 3923.60, and 4731.36; to enact sections 3922.01 to 3922.23; and to repeal sections 1751.831, 1751.84, 1751.85, 1751.88, 3901.80, 3901.81, 3901.82, 3901.83, 3901.84, 3923.66, 3923.67, 3923.68, 3923.681, 3923.69, 3923.70, 3923.75, 3923.76, 3923.77, 3923.78, and 3923.79 of the Revised Code to use the compendia adopted by the United States Department of Health and Human Services to determine whether an insurer may exclude coverage for off-label drug usage and to revise the external review process used by health plan issuers.
Title
To use the compendia adopted by the United States Department of Health and Human Services to determine whether an insurer may exclude coverage for off-label drug usage and to revise the external review process used by health plan issuers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-21 - House - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-26 | Effective Date | |
2011-09-26 | Governor' Action | |
2011-10-07 | End of 10-day period | |
2011-09-26 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-09-21 | Concurrence | |
2011-09-20 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2011-09-20 | Committee Report - S | |
2011-06-24 | To Insurance, Commerce, & Labor | |
2011-06-24 | Introduced to Senate | |
2011-06-22 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2011-06-15 | Committee Report | |
2011-05-04 | To Insurance | |
2011-05-04 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
17 | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
17 | 51 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 51 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 51 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 51 | 66 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 51 | 77 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 51 | 78 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 51 | 811 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 51 | 83 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 51 | 831 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
17 | 51 | 84 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
17 | 51 | 85 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
17 | 51 | 87 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 51 | 88 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
17 | 51 | 89 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
39 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
39 | 01 | 045 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 01 | 80 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
39 | 01 | 81 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
39 | 01 | 82 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
39 | 01 | 83 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
39 | 01 | 84 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
39 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 22 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 22 | 02 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 22 | 03 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 22 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 22 | 05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 22 | 06 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 22 | 07 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 22 | 08 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 22 | 09 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 22 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 22 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 22 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 22 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 22 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 22 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 22 | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 22 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 22 | 18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 22 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 22 | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 22 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 22 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
39 | 23 | 60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 23 | 66 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
39 | 23 | 67 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
39 | 23 | 68 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
39 | 23 | 681 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
39 | 23 | 69 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
39 | 23 | 70 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
39 | 23 | 75 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
39 | 23 | 76 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
39 | 23 | 77 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
39 | 23 | 78 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
39 | 23 | 79 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 31 | 36 | Amended Code | Citation Text |