OH HB212 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Re-referred: Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 3701.021 and 3701.022 of the Revised Code to expand eligibility for the Program for Medically Handicapped Children to individuals up to age 26 and to make an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expand eligibility - Program for Medically Handicapped Children

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-10 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-10HouseRe-referred: Finance
2021-06-01HouseReported - Substitute: Families, Aging, and Human Services
2021-03-17HouseRefer to Committee: Families, Aging, and Human Services
2021-03-16HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3701021Amended CodeCitation Text
3701022Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-212
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb212/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb212/RH/01/hb212_01_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb212/RCH/02/hb212_02_RCH?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16275&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16299&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16554&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16883&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16909&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17023&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17040&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-212

Bill Comments

feedback