OH HB21 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 43-28)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Refer to Committee: Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 2108.05, 2108.23, 2108.34, 4503.10, and 4503.721; to enact section 4501.027; and to repeal sections 4506.081, 4507.231, and 4507.501 of the Revised Code to increase the annual contribution for the "Donate Life" license plate and requested contributions to the Second Chance Trust Fund and to provide additional opportunities for Ohio residents to register as an organ donor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards organ donor registration and license plates

Sponsors

Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]Rep. Adam Bird [R]Rep. Willis Blackshear [D]
Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. Jamie Callender [R]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]
Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]Rep. Gary Click [R]Rep. Erica Crawley [D]Rep. Rodney Creech [R]
Rep. Jon Cross [R]Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]Rep. Sedrick Denson [D]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]
Rep. Mark Fraizer [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]
Rep. Diane Grendell [R]Rep. Jennifer Gross [R]Rep. Thomas Hall [R]Rep. Paula Hicks-Hudson [D]
Rep. Brett Hudson Hillyer [R]Rep. James Hoops [R]Rep. Larry Householder [R]Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]
Rep. Dontavius Jarrells [D]Rep. Marilyn John [R]Rep. Mark Johnson [R]Rep. Don Jones [R]
Rep. Darrell Kick [R]Rep. Jeff LaRe [R]Rep. Brian Lampton [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]
Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Michele Lepore-Hagan [D]Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]Rep. Scott Lipps [R]
Rep. Beth Liston [D]Rep. Mike Loychik [R]Rep. Adam Miller [D]Rep. Jessica Miranda [D]
Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Rep. Scott Oelslager [R]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Gail Pavliga [R]
Rep. Phil Plummer [R]Rep. Sharon Ray [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Phillip Robinson [D]
Rep. Bill Roemer [R]Rep. Allison Russo [D]Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]
Rep. Kent Smith [D]Rep. Monique Smith [D]Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]Rep. Dick Stein [R]
Rep. Brian Stewart [R]Rep. Reggie Stoltzfus [R]Rep. Bride Sweeney [D]Rep. Daniel Troy [D]
Rep. Terrence Upchurch [D]Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Andrea White [R]
Rep. Shane Wilkin [R]Rep. Bob Young [R]Rep. Tom Young [R]

Roll Calls

2021-03-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-24SenateRefer to Committee: Transportation
2021-03-23SenateIntroduced
2021-03-17HousePassed
2021-03-10HouseReported: Transportation and Public Safety
2021-02-04HouseRefer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety
2021-02-03HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
210805Amended CodeCitation Text
210823Amended CodeCitation Text
210834Amended CodeCitation Text
4501027New CodeSee Bill Text
450310Amended CodeCitation Text
4503721Amended CodeCitation Text
4506081Repealed CodeCitation Text
4507231Repealed CodeCitation Text
4507501Repealed CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-21
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb21/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb21/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb21/PH/02?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15553&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15800&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15942&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15985&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16095&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16115&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-21

Bill Comments 750

feedback