OH HB21 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Effective 9/28/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Effective 9/28/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 3301.0711, 3310.522, 3313.612, 3314.016, 3314.03, and 3314.11; to enact new section 3301.0713 and section 3781.1010; and to repeal section 3301.0713 of the Revised Code to make changes regarding the verification of community school enrollments, to prescribe an annual public comment period for the community school sponsor evaluation system, to exempt certain chartered nonpublic schools from state testing and graduation requirements, to prescribe a one-year moratorium on the building code requirement for schools to have storm shelters, to eliminate the current Education Management Information System (EMIS) Advisory Board, and to require the Department of Education to establish a new EMIS Advisory Council.
Title
Verify community school enrollments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-23 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-29 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-29 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-28 | Effective 9/28/18 | |
2018-06-07 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Passed |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Education |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Education |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-12-13 | House | Passed |
2017-11-29 | House | Reported - Substitute: Education and Career Readiness |
2017-02-08 | House | Refer to Committee: Education and Career Readiness |
2017-02-01 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
33 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 01 | 0711 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 01 | 0713 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
33 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 10 | 522 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 13 | 612 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 14 | 016 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 14 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 14 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |