OH HB203 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-14)
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-13 - Referred to committee: Workforce and Higher Education
Pending: Senate Workforce and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-13 - Referred to committee: Workforce and Higher Education
Pending: Senate Workforce and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 4113.61 of the Revised Code to require owners of private construction projects to timely pay contractors.
Title
Require private construction project owner timely pay contractors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-12-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 76 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-05 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-15 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-11 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-05 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-15 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-11 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-13 | Senate | Referred to committee: Workforce and Higher Education |
2023-12-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-12-06 | House | Passed |
2023-10-11 | House | Reported - Amended: Commerce and Labor |
2023-06-07 | House | Referred to committee: Commerce and Labor |
2023-06-06 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 13 | 61 | Amended Code | Citation Text |