OH HB203 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 39-25)
Status: Enrolled on May 20 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-05-20 - Passed - Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 1751.91, 3923.89, 4715.14, 4715.30, 4715.36, 4723.28, 4729.01, 4729.39, 4730.25, and 5164.14 and to enact sections 4715.70, 4715.71, and 4715.72 of the Revised Code to specify requirements for the operation of mobile dental facilities and to authorize pharmacists to enter consult agreements with certain physician assistants and advanced practice registered nurses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Specifies requirements for mobile dental facility operations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-20 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-20SenatePassed - Amended
2020-05-15SenateReported: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2019-11-13SenateRefer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2019-11-07SenateIntroduced
2019-11-06HousePassed
2019-06-26HouseReported - Amended: Health
2019-04-30HouseRefer to Committee: Health
2019-04-16HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
175191Amended CodeCitation Text
392389Amended CodeCitation Text
47Amended CodeCitation Text
4715Amended CodeCitation Text
471514Amended CodeCitation Text
471530Amended CodeCitation Text
471536Amended CodeCitation Text
471570New CodeSee Bill Text
471571New CodeSee Bill Text
471572New CodeSee Bill Text
472328Amended CodeCitation Text
472901Amended CodeCitation Text
472939Amended CodeCitation Text
473025Amended CodeCitation Text
516414Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback