OH HB202 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 72-37)
Status: Enrolled on November 14 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-11-14 - Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To enact section 5.481 of the Revised Code to designate the first Saturday of May as "Veterans Suicide Awareness Day."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designate Veterans Suicide Awareness Day

Sponsors

Rep. Andy Thompson [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]Rep. Terry Johnson [R]Rep. Daniel Ramos [D]
Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Wes Retherford [R]Rep. Steven Arndt [R]Rep. John Rogers [D]
Rep. Mike Duffey [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Stephanie Howse [D]Rep. Ryan Smith [R]
Rep. Mark Romanchuk [R]Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]Rep. Michele Lepore-hagan [D]Rep. Marlene Anielski [R]
Rep. Brian Hill [R]Rep. Eugene Miller [D]Rep. John Boccieri [D]Rep. Theresa Gavarone [R]
Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]Rep. Gary Scherer [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Robert Sprague [R]
Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Bill Dean [R]Rep. Andrew Brenner [R]Rep. Bernadine Kent [D]
Rep. Robert Cupp [R]Rep. Candice Keller [R]Rep. Alicia Reece [D]Rep. Keith Faber [R]
Rep. Al Landis [R]Rep. Ron Young [R]Rep. Paul Zeltwanger [R]Rep. Niraj Antani [R]
Rep. Nickie Antonio [D]Rep. Michael Ashford [D]Rep. Louis Blessing [R]Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]
Rep. Barbara Boyd [D]Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. James Butler [R]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]
Rep. Nicholas Celebrezze [D]Rep. Jack Cera [D]Rep. Kathleen Clyde [D]Rep. Hearcel Craig [D]
Rep. Jonathan Dever [R]Rep. Anthony DeVitis [R]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Teresa Fedor [D]
Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Doug Green [R]Rep. Christina Hagan [R]Rep. Michael Henne [R]
Rep. Glenn Holmes [D]Sen. Jim Hughes [R]Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]Rep. Brigid Kelly [D]
Rep. Darrell Kick [R]Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]Rep. George Lang [R]Rep. Sarah LaTourette [R]
Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Scott Lipps [R]Rep. Nathan Manning [R]Rep. John Patterson [D]
Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Dorothy Pelanda [R]Rep. Rick Perales [R]Rep. Bill Reineke [R]
Rep. Kristina Roegner [R]Rep. Scott Ryan [R]Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]
Rep. Fred Strahorn [D]Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]Rep. Scott Wiggam [R]Sen. Joseph Uecker [R]
Sen. Louis Terhar [R]Sen. Jason Wilson [D]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]
Sen. Kevin Bacon [R]Sen. Bill Beagle [R]Sen. Edna Brown [D]Sen. Dave Burke [R]
Sen. William Coley [R]Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]Sen. John Eklund [R]Sen. Randall Gardner [R]
Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Matt Huffman [R]Sen. Kris Jordan [R]Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]
Sen. Frank LaRose [R]Sen. Peggy Lehner [R]Sen. Gayle Manning [R]Sen. Robert McColley [R]
Sen. Larry Obhof [R]Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]Sen. Bob Peterson [R]Sen. Joseph Schiavoni [D]
Sen. Michael Skindell [D]Sen. Charleta Tavares [D]Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Sandra Williams [D]
Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2018-11-14 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-14SenatePassed
2018-04-17SenateReported: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
2018-01-17SenateRefer to Committee: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
2017-12-18SenateIntroduced
2017-12-13HousePassed
2017-05-25HouseReported: Armed Services, Veterans Affairs, and Homeland Security
2017-05-09HouseRefer to Committee: Armed Services, Veterans Affairs, and Homeland Security
2017-05-03HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback