OH HB2 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Effective 4/14/20 - Reappropriation authority effective January 13, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To enact sections 122.178, 122.179, 122.1710, and 122.1711 of the Revised Code and to amend Sections 259.10, 259.20, and 259.30 of H.B. 166 of the 133rd General Assembly to create the TechCred Program and the Individual Microcredential Assistance Program and to develop a grant program to support industry sector partnerships.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Create TechCred and Microcredential Assistance Programs

Sponsors

Rep. Jon Cross [R]Rep. Gil Blair [D]Sen. Louis Blessing [R]Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]
Rep. Janine Boyd [D]Rep. Juanita Brent [D]Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. James Butler [R]
Rep. Jamie Callender [R]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]Rep. Randi Clites [D]
Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]Rep. Robert Cupp [R]Rep. Anthony DeVitis [R]Rep. Sedrick Denson [D]
Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]
Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]Rep. Diane Grendell [R]Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]Rep. Paula Hicks-Hudson [D]
Rep. Brett Hudson Hillyer [R]Rep. Adam Holmes [R]Rep. James Hoops [R]Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]
Rep. Don Jones [R]Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]Rep. Scott Lipps [R]
Rep. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Adam Miller [D]Rep. Joe Miller [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]
Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]Rep. John Patterson [D]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Rick Perales [R]
Rep. Phil Plummer [R]Rep. Bill Reineke [R]Rep. Bill Roemer [R]Rep. John Rogers [D]
Rep. Mark Romanchuk [R]Rep. Allison Russo [D]Rep. Gary Scherer [R]Rep. William Seitz [R]
Rep. Kent Smith [D]Rep. Ryan Smith [R]Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]Rep. Dick Stein [R]
Rep. Fred Strahorn [D]Rep. Bride Sweeney [D]Rep. Emilia Strong Sykes [D]Rep. Terrence Upchurch [D]
Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]Sen. Andrew Brenner [R]Sen. William Coley [R]
Sen. Hearcel Craig [D]Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]Sen. John Eklund [R]Rep. Teresa Fedor [D]
Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Matt Huffman [R]
Sen. Stephen Huffman [R]Sen. Terry Johnson [R]Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]Sen. Peggy Lehner [R]
Sen. Nathan Manning [R]Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]Sen. Larry Obhof [R]Sen. Bob Peterson [R]
Sen. Michael Rulli [R]Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]
Sen. Sandra Williams [D]Sen. Steve Wilson [R]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2019-11-19 - House - House Failed (Y: 0 N: 92 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-11-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-14 Effective 4/14/20 - Reappropriation authority effective January 13, 2020
2019-12-12HouseConference report agreed to
2019-12-11SenateConference report agreed to: Conference Committee on HB 2
2019-12-04HouseConference managers: Reps. - Oelslager, Cross, Sobecki
2019-11-26SenateInsist on amendments; asks for committee of conference
2019-11-19HouseRefused to concur in Senate amendments
2019-11-13SenatePassed - Amended
2019-11-06SenateReported - Substitute: Finance
2019-07-17SenateRefer to Committee: Finance
2019-06-13SenateIntroduced
2019-06-12HousePassed - Amended
2019-06-11HouseReported - Substitute: Finance
2019-06-05HouseRe-referred: Finance
2019-06-05HouseRe-referred - Substitute: Rules and Reference
2019-05-14HouseRefer to Committee: Economic and Workforce Development
2019-05-13HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1New CodeSee Bill Text
122New CodeSee Bill Text
1221710New CodeSee Bill Text
1221711New CodeSee Bill Text
122178New CodeSee Bill Text
122179New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA133-HB-2
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb2/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb2/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb2/RCH/02?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb2/RH/03?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb2/PH/04?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb2/RS/05?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb2/PS/06?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb2/CR/07?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb2/EN/08?format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA133-HB-2

Bill Comments

feedback