OH HB199 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-02 - Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
Pending: Senate Transportation, Commerce and Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 715.27, 3781.102, 4740.01, 4740.02, 4740.04, 4740.12, and 4764.03 of the Revised Code to require commercial roofing contractors to have a license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Licenses commercial roofing contractors

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-11-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 64 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-02SenateRefer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
2020-11-24SenateIntroduced
2020-11-18HousePassed
2020-09-24HouseInformally passed
2020-09-22HouseInformally passed
2020-02-06HouseReported: Commerce and Labor
2019-04-30HouseRefer to Committee: Commerce and Labor
2019-04-16HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
37Amended CodeCitation Text
3781Amended CodeCitation Text
3781102Amended CodeCitation Text
47Amended CodeCitation Text
4740Amended CodeCitation Text
474001Amended CodeCitation Text
474002Amended CodeCitation Text
474004Amended CodeCitation Text
474012Amended CodeCitation Text
4764Amended CodeCitation Text
476403Amended CodeCitation Text
7Amended CodeCitation Text
715Amended CodeCitation Text
71527Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback