OH HB199 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 22-2)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Effective 3/23/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 9.02, 109.572, 1181.21, 1181.25, 1315.21, 1319.12, 1321.02, 1321.51, 1321.52, 1321.53, 1321.54, 1321.55, 1321.551, 1321.57, 1321.58, 1321.59, 1321.60, 1321.631, 1321.72, 1321.99, 1322.01, 1322.02, 1322.021, 1322.023, 1322.024, 1322.025, 1322.03, 1322.031, 1322.04, 1322.041, 1322.042, 1322.043, 1322.05, 1322.051, 1322.052, 1322.06, 1322.061, 1322.065, 1322.07, 1322.072, 1322.073, 1322.074, 1322.075, 1322.081, 1322.09, 1322.10, 1322.11, 1322.12, 1322.99, 1329.71, 1335.02, 1345.01, 1349.27, 1349.43, 1349.44, 1349.45, 1349.99, 2923.31, 4712.01, 4719.01, 4728.11, 4735.05, and 4763.03; to amend, for the purpose of adopting new section numbers as indicated in parentheses, sections 1322.02 (1322.07), 1322.021 (1322.16), 1322.023 (1322.05), 1322.024 (1322.02), 1322.025 (1322.55), 1322.03 (1322.09), 1322.031 (1322.20), 1322.04 (1322.10), 1322.041 (1322.21), 1322.042 (1322.24), 1322.043 (1322.25), 1322.05 (1322.32), 1322.051 (1322.27), 1322.052 (1322.28), 1322.06 (1322.34), 1322.061 (1322.36), 1322.065 (1322.17), 1322.07 (1322.40), 1322.072 (1322.35), 1322.073 (1322.15), 1322.074 (1322.41), 1322.075 (1322.42), 1322.081 (1322.45), 1322.09 (1322.46), 1322.10 (1322.50), 1322.101 (1322.51), 1322.11 (1322.52), and 1322.12 (1322.57); to enact new sections 1322.04 and 1322.12 and sections 1322.29, 1322.30, 1322.43, and 1322.56; and to repeal sections 1321.521, 1321.522, 1321.531, 1321.532, 1321.533, 1321.534, 1321.535, 1321.536, 1321.537, 1321.538, 1321.552, 1321.592, 1321.593, 1321.594, 1322.022, 1322.062, 1322.063, 1322.064, 1322.071, and 1322.08 of the Revised Code to create the Ohio Residential Mortgage Lending Act for the purpose of regulating all non-depository lending secured by residential real estate, to limit the application of the current Mortgage Loan Law to unsecured loans and loans secured by other than residential real estate, and to modify an exemption to the Ohio Consumer Installment Loan Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enact Ohio Residential Mortgage Lending Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-11-15 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-15 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-14 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 77 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-23 Effective 3/23/18
2017-11-29HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2017-11-15SenatePassed
2017-11-14SenateReported - Substitute: Insurance and Financial Institutions
2017-06-28SenateRefer to Committee: Insurance and Financial Institutions
2017-06-22SenateIntroduced
2017-06-21HousePassed
2017-06-20HouseReported - Substitute: Financial Institutions, Housing, and Urban Development
2017-05-09HouseRefer to Committee: Financial Institutions, Housing, and Urban Development
2017-05-02HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
109Amended CodeCitation Text
109572Amended CodeCitation Text
11Amended CodeCitation Text
1181Amended CodeCitation Text
118121Amended CodeCitation Text
118125Amended CodeCitation Text
13Amended CodeCitation Text
1315Amended CodeCitation Text
131521Amended CodeCitation Text
1319Amended CodeCitation Text
131912Amended CodeCitation Text
1321Amended CodeCitation Text
132102Amended CodeCitation Text
132151Amended CodeCitation Text
132152Amended CodeCitation Text
1321521Repealed CodeCitation Text
1321522Repealed CodeCitation Text
132153Amended CodeCitation Text
1321531Amended CodeCitation Text
1321532Amended CodeCitation Text
1321533Repealed CodeCitation Text
1321534Repealed CodeCitation Text
1321535Repealed CodeCitation Text
1321536Repealed CodeCitation Text
1321537Repealed CodeCitation Text
1321538Repealed CodeCitation Text
132154Amended CodeCitation Text
132155Amended CodeCitation Text
1321551Amended CodeCitation Text
1321552Repealed CodeCitation Text
132157Amended CodeCitation Text
132158Amended CodeCitation Text
132159Amended CodeCitation Text
1321592Repealed CodeCitation Text
1321593Amended CodeCitation Text
1321594Repealed CodeCitation Text
132160Amended CodeCitation Text
1321631Amended CodeCitation Text
132172Amended CodeCitation Text
132199Amended CodeCitation Text
1322Amended CodeCitation Text
132201Amended CodeCitation Text
132202Amended CodeCitation Text
1322021Amended CodeCitation Text
1322022Repealed CodeCitation Text
1322023Amended CodeCitation Text
1322024Amended CodeCitation Text
1322025Amended CodeCitation Text
132203Amended CodeCitation Text
1322031Amended CodeCitation Text
132204Amended CodeCitation Text
1322041Amended CodeCitation Text
1322042Amended CodeCitation Text
1322043Amended CodeCitation Text
132205Amended CodeCitation Text
1322051Amended CodeCitation Text
1322052Amended CodeCitation Text
132206Amended CodeCitation Text
1322061Amended CodeCitation Text
1322062Repealed CodeCitation Text
1322063Repealed CodeCitation Text
1322064Repealed CodeCitation Text
1322065Amended CodeCitation Text
132207Amended CodeCitation Text
1322071Repealed CodeCitation Text
1322072Amended CodeCitation Text
1322073Amended CodeCitation Text
1322074Amended CodeCitation Text
1322075Amended CodeCitation Text
132208Repealed CodeCitation Text
1322081Amended CodeCitation Text
132209Amended CodeCitation Text
132210Amended CodeCitation Text
1322101Amended CodeCitation Text
132211Amended CodeCitation Text
132212Amended CodeCitation Text
132299Amended CodeCitation Text
1329Amended CodeCitation Text
132971Amended CodeCitation Text
1335Amended CodeCitation Text
133502Amended CodeCitation Text
1345Amended CodeCitation Text
134501Amended CodeCitation Text
1349Amended CodeCitation Text
134927Amended CodeCitation Text
134943Amended CodeCitation Text
134944Amended CodeCitation Text
134945Amended CodeCitation Text
134999Amended CodeCitation Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2923Amended CodeCitation Text
292331Amended CodeCitation Text
47Amended CodeCitation Text
4712Amended CodeCitation Text
471201Amended CodeCitation Text
4719Amended CodeCitation Text
471901Amended CodeCitation Text
4728Amended CodeCitation Text
472811Amended CodeCitation Text
4735Amended CodeCitation Text
473505Amended CodeCitation Text
4763Amended CodeCitation Text
476303Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback