OH HB198 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-22 - To Ways & Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-22 - To Ways & Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 5709.40, 5709.73, 5709.77, 5709.78, and 5709.911 of the Revised Code to establish a procedure by which political subdivisions proposing a tax increment financing (TIF) incentive district are required to provide notice to the record owner of each parcel within the proposed incentive district before creating the district, and to permit such owners, under specific conditions, to exclude their parcels from the incentive district by submitting a written response.
Title
To establish a procedure by which political subdivisions proposing a tax increment financing (TIF) incentive district are required to provide notice to the record owner of each parcel within the proposed incentive district before creating the district, and to permit such owners, under specific conditions, to exclude their parcels from the incentive district by submitting a written response.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-21 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 83 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-22 | To Ways & Means | |
2014-05-22 | Introduced to Senate | |
2014-05-21 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-04-02 | Committee Report* S | |
2013-06-05 | To State and Local Government | |
2013-06-05 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 09 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 09 | 73 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 09 | 77 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 09 | 78 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 09 | 911 | Amended Code | Citation Text |