OH HB197 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 40-14)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-02-16 - Refer to Committee: Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend section 5747.98 and to enact sections 122.91 and 5747.82 of the Revised Code to authorize a temporary income tax credit for an employer's expenses to train a commercial vehicle operator.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorize income tax credit-training commercial vehicle operator

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-16SenateRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2022-02-09HousePassed
2021-06-09HouseReported - Substitute: Ways and Means
2021-03-16HouseRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2021-03-10HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
12291New CodeSee Bill Text
574782New CodeSee Bill Text
574798Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-197
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb197/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb197/RH/01/hb197_01_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb197/PH/02/hb197_02_PH?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16479&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16704&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16969&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16982&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17533&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18409&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18606&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-197

Bill Comments

feedback