OH HB184 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-02 - Effective 6/13/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-02 - Effective 6/13/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 742.38 of the Revised Code to revise Ohio Police and Fire Pension Fund disability determination procedures.
Title
Revise Police and Fire Pension Fund disability determinations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-17 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-17 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Effective 6/13/22 | |
2022-03-02 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Passed |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Reported - Amended: Insurance |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Insurance |
2021-06-23 | House | Passed |
2021-06-22 | House | Reported: Financial Institutions |
2021-03-10 | House | Refer to Committee: Financial Institutions |
2021-03-09 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Employment
Retirement
State and Local Government
State and Local Government : Public Officials and Employees
State and Local Government : State Government
Retirement
State and Local Government
State and Local Government : Public Officials and Employees
State and Local Government : State Government
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
7 | 42 | 38 | Amended Code | Citation Text |