OH HB178 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-20)
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-20)
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 3313.976, 3314.03, 3326.11, 3328.24, and 3737.73 and to enact section 3319.46 of the Revised Code and to amend Sections 263.10 and 263.230 of Am. Sub. H.B. 59 of the 130th General Assembly, as subsequently amended, with respect to school safety drills in public and private schools; the use of seclusion and physical restraint on students and positive behavior intervention supports in public schools; and the qualification of private schools that are located within the boundaries of a city, local, or exempted village school district adjacent to the pilot project school district for the Pilot Project Scholarship Program and to make an appropriation.
Title
And to amend Sections 263.10 and 263.230 of Am. Sub. H.B. 59 of the 130th General Assembly, as subsequently amended, with respect to school safety drills in public and private schools; the use of seclusion and physical restraint on students and positive behavior intervention supports in public schools; and the qualification of private schools that are located within the boundaries of a city, local, or exempted village school district adjacent to the pilot project school district for the Pilot Project Scholarship Program and to make an appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-17 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-19 | Governor' Action | |
2014-12-17 | Concurrence | |
2014-12-11 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-12-10 | Committee Report - S | |
2014-03-20 | To Education | |
2014-03-20 | Introduced to Senate | |
2014-03-19 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-12-11 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-05-28 | To Education | |
2013-05-28 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
33 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 13 | 976 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 14 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
33 | 19 | 46 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 26 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 26 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 28 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 28 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
37 | 37 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
37 | 37 | 73 | Amended Code | Citation Text |