OH HB177 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-10 - Effective 3/2/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To enact section 9.16 of the Revised Code to allow a governmental entity to utilize distributed ledger technology, including blockchain technology.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allow government use distributed ledger technology, blockchain

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-11-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-19 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-10 Effective 3/2/22
2021-11-10SenatePassed
2021-10-19SenateReported: Financial Institutions and Technology
2021-05-12SenateRefer to Committee: Financial Institutions and Technology
2021-05-06HousePassed
2021-04-15HouseReported: Technology and Innovation
2021-03-09HouseRefer to Committee: Technology and Innovation
2021-03-04HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-177
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb177/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb177/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb177/PH/02/hb177_02_PH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb177/RS/03/hb177_03_RS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb177/PS/04/hb177_04_PS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb177/EN/05/hb177_05_EN?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16031&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16147&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16413&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16577&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16725&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17601&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17602&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17618&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17850&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17899&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18141&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-177

Bill Comments

feedback