OH HB176 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 28 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2015-11-19 - Reported: Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 5577.044, 5735.01, 5735.012, 5739.025, 5747.98, and 5751.98 and to enact sections 122.079, 5735.015, 5735.016, 5747.78, and 5751.55 of the Revised Code to create the Gaseous Fuel Vehicle Conversion Program, to allow a credit against the income or commercial activity tax for the purchase or conversion of an alternative fuel vehicle, to reduce the amount of sales tax due on the purchase or lease of a qualifying electric vehicle by up to $500, to apply the motor fuel tax to the distribution or sale of compressed natural gas, to authorize a temporary, partial motor fuel tax exemption for sales of liquid and compressed natural gas used as motor fuel, to allow motor vehicles fueled by liquid natural gas to exceed gross vehicle weight limits by two thousand pounds, and to make an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises taxation of alternative fuels

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-11-19 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-16 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-11-19HouseReported: Finance
2015-09-16HouseRe-referred: Finance
2015-06-24HouseRe-referred - Substitute: Rules and Reference
2015-05-05HouseRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2015-04-28HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1New CodeSee Bill Text
122New CodeSee Bill Text
122079New CodeSee Bill Text
55Amended CodeCitation Text
5577Amended CodeCitation Text
5577044Amended CodeCitation Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5735Amended CodeCitation Text
573501Amended CodeCitation Text
5735012Amended CodeCitation Text
5735015New CodeSee Bill Text
5735016New CodeSee Bill Text
5739Amended CodeCitation Text
5739025Amended CodeCitation Text
5747Amended CodeCitation Text
574778New CodeSee Bill Text
574798Amended CodeCitation Text
5751Amended CodeCitation Text
575155New CodeSee Bill Text
575198Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback