OH HB168 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-15)
Status: Passed on October 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-29 - Effective 10/29/18 - Appropriations effective July 30, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 1721.21, 1721.211, 4717.03, 4717.13, 4717.14, 4717.36, 4767.01, 4767.02, 4767.03, 4767.04, 4767.05, 4767.06, 4767.07, and 4767.08 and to enact sections 4767.021, 4767.09, 4767.10, and 4767.11 of the Revised Code to modify duties of the Division of Real Estate in the Department of Commerce regarding cemetery registration, to specify cemetery owners must reasonably maintain cemeteries, to establish the Cemetery Grant Program, to allow the Board of Embalmers and Funeral Directors to review and vote upon certain license suspensions by telephone, to make various other changes to the embalmers, funeral directors, and crematory licensing laws, and to make an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modify cemetery law

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-21 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-29 Effective 10/29/18 - Appropriations effective July 30, 2018
2018-06-27SenatePassed
2018-02-28SenateReported: Finance
2017-11-15SenateRefer to Committee: Finance
2017-10-25SenateIntroduced
2017-10-24HousePassed
2017-09-21HouseReported - Substitute: Finance
2017-06-06HouseRe-referred: Finance
2017-06-06HouseRe-referred - Amended: Rules and Reference
2017-05-01HouseRefer to Committee: State and Local Government
2017-03-29HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
17Amended CodeCitation Text
1721Amended CodeCitation Text
172121Amended CodeCitation Text
1721211Amended CodeCitation Text
47Amended CodeCitation Text
4717Amended CodeCitation Text
471703Amended CodeCitation Text
471713Amended CodeCitation Text
471714Amended CodeCitation Text
471736Amended CodeCitation Text
4767Amended CodeCitation Text
476701Amended CodeCitation Text
476702Amended CodeCitation Text
4767021New CodeSee Bill Text
476703Amended CodeCitation Text
476704Amended CodeCitation Text
476705Amended CodeCitation Text
476706Amended CodeCitation Text
476707Amended CodeCitation Text
476708Amended CodeCitation Text
476709New CodeSee Bill Text
476710New CodeSee Bill Text
476711New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA132-HB-168
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb168/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb168/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb168/RCH/02?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb168/RH/03?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb168/PH/04?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb168/RS/05?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb168/PS/06?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb168/EN/07?format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA132-HB-168

Bill Comments

feedback